U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00273
  • Case Name: Maier v. Nunn
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [State Court Records Received - Conventional Filing]
  • August 08, 2022: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • August 08, 2022: [Response to Non - Motion]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Notice of Address Change]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 06, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 10, 2022: [Order for Response]
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Receipt]
  • April 05, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • April 05, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • April 01, 2022: [Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 01, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • April 01, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 01, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.