U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00278
  • Case Name: Jones v. Stitt et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [USCA Order]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Transcript Letter]
  • June 22, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • June 09, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • June 09, 2022: [Preliminary Record Letter - Tenth Circuit]
  • June 09, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
  • June 01, 2022: [Judgment]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Reply]
  • May 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 20, 2022: [Supplement]
  • May 20, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Supplement]
  • May 19, 2022: [Supplement]
  • May 12, 2022: [Objections]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • May 02, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 02, 2022: [Leave]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • April 25, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • April 25, 2022: [Brief]
  • April 20, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • April 19, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • April 18, 2022: [Leave]
  • April 12, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to File Amicus Brief]
  • April 12, 2022: [File Amicus Brief]
  • April 11, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order]
  • April 11, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 06, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 01, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 01, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • April 01, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • April 01, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.