U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00282
  • Case Name: Smith v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • July 14, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • July 14, 2022: [Preliminary Record Letter - Tenth Circuit]
  • July 13, 2022: [USCA Appeal Fee]
  • July 13, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Return of Service - NON SUMMONS]
  • June 16, 2022: [Judgment]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order]
  • June 16, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
  • June 13, 2022: [Return of Service - NON SUMMONS]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • May 11, 2022: [Return of Service - NON SUMMONS]
  • May 03, 2022: [Return of Service - NON SUMMONS]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Order]
  • April 21, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • April 20, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 15, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 06, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • April 05, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 04, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • April 04, 2022: [Pro Se Litigant's Request for Issuance of Summons]
  • April 04, 2022: [Receipt]
  • April 04, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.