U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00280
  • Case Name: Patel v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • January 13, 2023: [Protective Order]
  • January 10, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order]
  • January 10, 2023: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 10, 2023: [Extension of Time]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Order]
  • October 26, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • October 25, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • October 17, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • September 07, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • July 22, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • July 13, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • July 07, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 01, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Docket]
  • May 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 06, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 05, 2022: [Notice of Filing Notice of Removal]
  • April 04, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • April 04, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • April 04, 2022: [Jury Demand]
  • April 04, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • April 04, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 04, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • April 04, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.