U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00295
  • Case Name: Henson v. Wal-Mart Stores East LP
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Notice from the Court]
  • October 27, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 07, 2022: [Response to Motion]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 03, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 03, 2022: [Joint Status Report]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order]
  • April 12, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • April 06, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • April 06, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 06, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • April 06, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.