U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00298
  • Case Name: BMO Harris Banks N.A. v. B T Auto Transport LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • December 30, 2022: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 02, 2022: [Extension of Time]
October, 2022
  • October 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Extension of Time]
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 03, 2022: [Extension of Time]
July, 2022
  • July 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • July 01, 2022: [Extension of Time]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
  • May 13, 2022: [Entry of Default]
  • May 06, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • April 08, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • April 07, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • April 07, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.