U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00303
  • Case Name: Wiles v. Davis et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • January 09, 2023: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • June 09, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order]
  • June 08, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 02, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
May, 2022
  • May 12, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • May 10, 2022: [Docket]
  • May 09, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • April 08, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • April 08, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 08, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.