U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00309
  • Case Name: Schemmer v. Crow
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Receipt]
  • October 07, 2022: [Letter]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 07, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • September 07, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • September 06, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • September 06, 2022: [Preliminary Record Letter - Tenth Circuit]
  • September 06, 2022: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 06, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • August 10, 2022: [Preliminary Record Letter - Tenth Circuit]
  • August 10, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • August 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • August 05, 2022: [Preliminary Record Letter - Tenth Circuit]
  • August 05, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
  • August 05, 2022: [Reconsideration]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 21, 2022: [Order]
  • July 21, 2022: [Response to Non - Motion]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Order]
  • May 20, 2022: [Response to Non - Motion]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
  • April 26, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 11, 2022: [Receipt]
  • April 11, 2022: [Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • April 11, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • April 11, 2022: [Brief]
  • April 11, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 11, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.