U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00312
  • Case Name: Ikeda v. Homesite Indemnity Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
June, 2022
  • June 03, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Docket]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order]
  • April 13, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 13, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • April 13, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • April 12, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • April 12, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 12, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • April 12, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.