U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00311
  • Case Name: Coker v. SSM Health Bone and Joint et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • January 03, 2023: [Docket]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 21, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 16, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • December 09, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • December 09, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • December 02, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • December 01, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Strike]
  • November 18, 2022: [Objections]
  • November 18, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • November 18, 2022: [Witness List]
  • November 04, 2022: [Witness List]
  • November 04, 2022: [Exhibit List]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
August, 2022
  • August 03, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • July 08, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • June 07, 2022: [Docket]
  • June 01, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • May 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • May 17, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • May 04, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • April 13, 2022: [Notice of Filing Notice of Removal]
  • April 13, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • April 12, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • April 12, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 12, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.