U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00313
  • Case Name: Le v. Oklahoma Copier Solutions
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • July 08, 2022: [Order]
  • July 05, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • July 05, 2022: [Compel]
  • July 05, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 27, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • April 13, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • April 13, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.