U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00314
  • Case Name: Daspit v. Hive Helper LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 05, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 04, 2023: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • August 30, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 25, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 03, 2022: [Docket]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • May 27, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • May 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • May 25, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • May 25, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • May 25, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • May 03, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 02, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • April 28, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 15, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order]
  • April 13, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • April 13, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • April 13, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.