U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00315
  • Case Name: Seals v. Crow
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Judgment]
  • June 29, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • May 09, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Amended)]
  • May 09, 2022: [Notice of Address Change]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Receipt]
  • April 15, 2022: [Order]
  • April 14, 2022: [Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • April 14, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • April 14, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 14, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.