U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00316
  • Case Name: Morgan v. Brown et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order]
  • September 12, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
August, 2022
  • August 02, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 29, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 29, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 28, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • July 07, 2022: [Docket]
  • July 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 18, 2022: [Response to Motion]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 28, 2022: [Notice from the Court]
  • April 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 26, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 26, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • April 22, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 21, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 15, 2022: [Order]
  • April 15, 2022: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 15, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • April 14, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.