U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00317
  • Case Name: Adams v. The Geo Group Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Summons Issued]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order]
  • January 06, 2023: [~Notice (other)]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
  • December 15, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Notice of Address Change]
  • November 07, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • November 07, 2022: [Pro Se Litigant's Request for Issuance of Summons]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Order]
  • October 14, 2022: [Notice of Address Change]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • September 07, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • September 06, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • August 15, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • August 04, 2022: [USCA - Mandate Issued]
  • August 04, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order]
  • August 02, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 02, 2022: [Withdraw]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Order]
  • July 19, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • July 19, 2022: [Preliminary Record Letter - Tenth Circuit]
  • July 19, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
  • July 19, 2022: [Objections]
  • July 15, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • July 08, 2022: [Order]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • June 08, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • May 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 12, 2022: [Notice of Address Change]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order]
  • May 10, 2022: [Notice of Address Change]
  • May 06, 2022: [Receipt]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 15, 2022: [Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address]
  • April 15, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 15, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • April 15, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • April 15, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 15, 2022: [Affidavit]
  • April 15, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 15, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.