U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00318
  • Case Name: Garvin County Towing & Recovery LLC v. Hallmark County Mutual Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • November 21, 2022: [Vacate]
  • November 01, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 01, 2022: [Terminate Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • September 15, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • July 15, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 14, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • July 14, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • July 14, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 13, 2022: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 11, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 11, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • July 06, 2022: [Leave]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 26, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • May 11, 2022: [Docket]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • April 19, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • April 19, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • April 19, 2022: [Leave]
  • April 19, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 19, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • April 18, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • April 18, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 15, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • April 15, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.