U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00320
  • Case Name: Stanford v. Kingfisher County of
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Witness List]
  • January 23, 2023: [Exhibit List]
  • January 23, 2023: [Witness List - Expert]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • November 18, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • November 14, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • November 07, 2022: [Joint Status Report]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • June 23, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • June 02, 2022: [Protective Order]
May, 2022
  • May 13, 2022: [Docket]
  • May 12, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • May 12, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • April 21, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 18, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • April 18, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.