U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00319
  • Case Name: Savage v. Genesis Healthcare LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 24, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 24, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 01, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 02, 2022: [Leave]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • April 28, 2022: [Response in Support of Motion]
  • April 27, 2022: [Strike]
  • April 27, 2022: [Compel]
  • April 26, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 26, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 22, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 22, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • April 21, 2022: [Notice of Pending Motions]
  • April 20, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 19, 2022: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • April 19, 2022: [Jury Demand]
  • April 19, 2022: [Stay Case]
  • April 19, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • April 19, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • April 19, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • April 19, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 18, 2022: [Receipt]
  • April 18, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.