U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00322
  • Case Name: Sanchez v. Munn et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 11, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • July 14, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • June 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order]
  • May 04, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • April 21, 2022: [Order]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 19, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • April 19, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 19, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.