U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00323
  • Case Name: Alano v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 08, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 07, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 12, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 11, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 11, 2022: [Notice of Address Change]
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: [Certification of Issue to State Court]
  • June 01, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 01, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • May 25, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • May 24, 2022: [Order]
  • May 03, 2022: [Docket]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • April 26, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • April 26, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 19, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • April 19, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.