U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00324
  • Case Name: LoRusso v. Stitt
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • June 03, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • June 03, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 20, 2022: [Order]
  • May 19, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 19, 2022: [Complaint]
  • May 19, 2022: [Letter]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 19, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • April 19, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.