U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00325
  • Case Name: Rogers v. Taylor et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Mail Returned]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • May 24, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • May 16, 2022: [Notice of Address Change]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 28, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 19, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • April 19, 2022: [Letter]
  • April 19, 2022: [Stay Case]
  • April 19, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 19, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.