U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00330
  • Case Name: McCarty v. Nunn
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 19, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • June 29, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • June 13, 2022: [Receipt]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 09, 2022: [Extension of Time]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • May 20, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
  • May 04, 2022: [Order]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Order]
  • April 21, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 21, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • April 21, 2022: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
  • April 20, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.