U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00333
  • Case Name: Oscar et al v. United States of America et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • June 02, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
  • May 24, 2022: [Order]
  • May 12, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • May 12, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • May 05, 2022: [Letter]
  • May 05, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 05, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 05, 2022: [Order]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • April 28, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • April 21, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • April 21, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 21, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • April 21, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 21, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.