U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00331
  • Case Name: Terral v. Federal Employees Health Benefit Program et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • April 25, 2022: [Leave]
  • April 25, 2022: [Jury Demand]
  • April 25, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 22, 2022: [Notice of Filing Notice of Removal]
  • April 21, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • April 21, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 21, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.