U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00332
  • Case Name: Gebauer et al v. Metlife Auto and Home Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • January 11, 2023: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Exhibit List]
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • October 04, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Witness List]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 21, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • June 07, 2022: [Docket]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • April 27, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • April 27, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 21, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 21, 2022: [Jury Demand]
  • April 21, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • April 21, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.