U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00334
  • Case Name: Smith v. Kennedy et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • September 08, 2022: [Notice of Address Change]
  • September 07, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • September 06, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order]
  • June 07, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • May 11, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 09, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 09, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • May 05, 2022: [Docket]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 27, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 25, 2022: [Order for Response]
  • April 22, 2022: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
  • April 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 22, 2022: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.