U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00363
  • Case Name: Garcia v. GEO Group Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • July 11, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • June 03, 2022: [Mail Returned]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • May 27, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • May 27, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 04, 2022: [Order]
  • May 04, 2022: [Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address]
  • May 04, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • May 04, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • May 04, 2022: [Notice of Address Change]
  • May 04, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 04, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.