U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00365
  • Case Name: Sellman v. Aviation Training Consultants LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • December 15, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • December 15, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • December 02, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 15, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • June 29, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 27, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • June 21, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order]
  • June 09, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 08, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • June 08, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • May 31, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • May 27, 2022: [Docket]
  • May 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 19, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • May 19, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • May 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • May 12, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • May 04, 2022: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.