U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00362
  • Case Name: Torres v. The Geo Group Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 13, 2022: [Order]
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
  • June 03, 2022: [Mail Returned]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • May 06, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • May 06, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
  • May 04, 2022: [Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address]
  • May 04, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 04, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • May 04, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 04, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.