U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00370
  • Case Name: Nero v. State of Oklahoma
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • November 16, 2022: [USCA - Mandate Issued]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [USCA Order and Judgment]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 17, 2022: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 17, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • August 17, 2022: [USCA Order]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • July 19, 2022: [Preliminary Record Letter - Tenth Circuit]
  • July 19, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • June 07, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • June 07, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 03, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order]
  • June 03, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Receipt]
  • May 19, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • May 19, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 05, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 05, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • May 05, 2022: [Complaint]
  • May 05, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.