U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00368
  • Case Name: Fuchs v. Farmers Union Hospital Association et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • December 08, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 19, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • August 19, 2022: [Order]
  • August 19, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • August 18, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • August 03, 2022: [Docket]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • July 14, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • July 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • July 13, 2022: [Leave]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • July 01, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 20, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • June 01, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • May 31, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • May 31, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • May 23, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 05, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • May 05, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • May 05, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • May 05, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.