U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00369
  • Case Name: Sansone v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 06, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 06, 2023: [Entry of Appearance]
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • November 09, 2022: [Social Security Opening Brief]
  • November 09, 2022: [Reminder - General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 27, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • October 13, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • October 12, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 04, 2022: [Reminder - General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 12, 2022: [Extension of Time]
August, 2022
  • August 02, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
  • July 27, 2022: [Order]
  • July 22, 2022: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • July 22, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
  • July 22, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Order Declining Report and Recommendation]
  • May 20, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • May 20, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • May 11, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • May 09, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • May 05, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 05, 2022: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.