U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00372
  • Case Name: Boothe v. American Fidelity Assurance Co et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 02, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order]
  • September 01, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • August 10, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 08, 2022: [Docket]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • July 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 21, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • May 31, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • May 31, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • May 31, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • May 23, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 06, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • May 06, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • May 06, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • May 06, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.