U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00375
  • Case Name: Hendrix v. Klika et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 20, 2023: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order]
  • January 16, 2023: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • January 12, 2023: [Summons Issued]
  • January 03, 2023: [Amended Complaint]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • December 30, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • December 28, 2022: [Leave]
  • December 28, 2022: [Docket]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Status Report]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • June 27, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • June 27, 2022: [Stay Case]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Docket]
  • May 12, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • May 09, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • May 06, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • May 06, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • May 06, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.