U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00373
  • Case Name: Taylor et al v. Independent School District No I-089 of Oklahoma County et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 10, 2023: [Extension of Time]
  • January 02, 2023: [Exhibit List]
  • January 02, 2023: [Witness List]
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order]
  • October 04, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 04, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • September 15, 2022: [Docket]
  • September 13, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • September 08, 2022: [Leave]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Reply]
  • July 18, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 20, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 06, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • June 06, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
May, 2022
  • May 09, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • May 09, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • May 06, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • May 06, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.