U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00378
  • Case Name: Moquera-Rodriguez v. The Geo Group Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • August 09, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • June 06, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • June 06, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • June 06, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Order]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 09, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • May 09, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 09, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.