U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00380
  • Case Name: Wolter v. Grady County of
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Letter]
  • September 13, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • August 22, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Letter]
  • July 19, 2022: [Order]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order]
  • July 06, 2022: [Notice of Address Change]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Letter]
  • June 21, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 09, 2022: [Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 09, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • May 09, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 09, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.