U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00379
  • Case Name: Carlos v. The Geo Group Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order]
  • August 03, 2022: [Letter]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 28, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • June 07, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • June 07, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • June 01, 2022: [Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Receipt]
  • May 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 10, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • May 10, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 10, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.