U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00381
  • Case Name: Warcon LLC v. Lavastida Development Group LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • August 02, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • July 21, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 21, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • July 19, 2022: [Order]
  • July 18, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • July 18, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 18, 2022: [Order]
  • July 15, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • July 15, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • May 10, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • May 10, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.