U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00382
  • Case Name: Walsh v. A&E Enterprises Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Judgment - Consent]
  • January 10, 2023: [Approve Consent Judgment]
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Order for Response]
  • July 18, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • July 12, 2022: [Docket]
  • July 07, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 08, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 06, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • June 06, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order for Response]
  • May 11, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • May 11, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.