U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00385
  • Case Name: Dean v. Progressive Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 19, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 12, 2023: [Entry of Appearance]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • November 02, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • October 27, 2022: [Subpoena Returned Executed as to Non-party]
  • October 27, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • October 24, 2022: [Subpoena Returned Executed as to Non-party]
  • October 24, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • October 10, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • September 09, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 20, 2022: [Order]
  • July 20, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • July 20, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • July 18, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • July 14, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • July 12, 2022: [Docket]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand]
  • June 08, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order]
  • June 08, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Remand]
  • May 17, 2022: [Docket]
  • May 12, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • May 11, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • May 11, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • May 11, 2022: [Notice of Filing Notice of Removal]
  • May 11, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • May 11, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.