U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00387
  • Case Name: Wood v. Stuart C Irby Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Transfer Case]
  • October 13, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • October 11, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Order]
  • September 28, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 21, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • September 21, 2022: [Transfer Case]
  • September 13, 2022: [Docket]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand]
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • May 31, 2022: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • May 23, 2022: [Remand]
  • May 18, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • May 18, 2022: [Counterclaim]
  • May 18, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • May 13, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • May 11, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • May 11, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.