U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00388
  • Case Name: Stone v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
  • October 31, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
August, 2022
  • August 02, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand to Agency]
  • August 02, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • August 02, 2022: [General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
  • August 01, 2022: [Remand to Agency]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • May 13, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • May 12, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • May 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 12, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 12, 2022: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.