U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00391
  • Case Name: Lamle et al v. Brown et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Judgment]
  • May 01, 2025: [USCA - Mandate Issued]
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [USCA Judgment]
  • April 09, 2025: [USCA Opinion]
September, 2022
  • September 02, 2022: [Surreply]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Reply]
  • August 22, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • August 22, 2022: [Leave to File Reply]
  • August 19, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 18, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 12, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • August 12, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 05, 2022: [Dismiss]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 27, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • July 15, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • July 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 13, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • July 08, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • July 08, 2022: [Order]
  • July 07, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 07, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 01, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • June 07, 2022: [Dismiss]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • May 24, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 20, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • May 13, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • May 12, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • May 12, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • May 12, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.