U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00390
  • Case Name: Tucker v. Marsee et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [USCA - Mandate Issued]
  • August 23, 2022: [USCA Order]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 15, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • July 14, 2022: [Preliminary Record Letter - Tenth Circuit]
  • July 14, 2022: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 14, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 24, 2022: [Order]
  • May 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 19, 2022: [Letter]
  • May 19, 2022: [Pro Se Litigant's Request for Issuance of Summons]
  • May 12, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • May 12, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 12, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.