U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00392
  • Case Name: Bembry et al v. Abbott Laboratories Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 02, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • June 02, 2022: [Conditional Transfer Order]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • May 20, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • May 18, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • May 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 14, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • May 13, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • May 13, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • May 12, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • May 12, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • May 12, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.