U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00394
  • Case Name: Rackley v. Crow
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Notice of Address Change]
  • June 03, 2022: [Receipt]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Order]
  • May 13, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 13, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • May 13, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.