U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00395
  • Case Name: Williamson v. Nunn
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 29, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • June 28, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Receipt]
  • May 31, 2022: [Letter]
  • May 27, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • May 19, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • May 19, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
  • May 13, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 13, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • May 13, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 13, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.