U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00396
  • Case Name: Nelson et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand to State Court]
  • December 16, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Order]
  • August 19, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
July, 2022
  • July 06, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • July 01, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
June, 2022
  • June 10, 2022: [Remand to State Court]
  • June 10, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • May 23, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • May 23, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • May 23, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • May 17, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • May 17, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • May 16, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.